Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fritz Fuchs (until 1984-06-30) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rolf Maier (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Klaus Bury (until 1989-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Michael Damgen (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-04-06 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Wohrlin (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-07-21 | ||||
Herbert Briem (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-06-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Ralf Schopperle (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-07 | ||||
Thomas Stickroth (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | ||||
Gabor Zele (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Henryk Kruppa (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-20 | ||||
Hermann Rudolf (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-10-07 | ||||
Hans-Peter Schulzke (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1984-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Guido Stetter (from 1984-01-01) (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-12-16 | ||||
Bernd Krajczy (until 1984-06-30) | 1962-05-30 | ||||
Reinhard Binder (until 1984-06-30) | 1955-10-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Stachelin (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-03-13 | ||||
Herbert Reiss (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-02-21 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Mahn (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-10-26 | ||||
Robert Birner (until 1983-10-02) | 1958-02-16 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:30 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1983-10-08 15:30 |
1 : 4 |
Schema Compare |