Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Paul Sauter (until 1984-06-30) | 1947-06-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Farber (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-09-18 | ||||
Walter Modick (until 1984-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Karsten Krannich (until 1984-06-30) | 1965-07-29 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Assion (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-08-24 | ||||
Gunter Berti (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-07-31 | ||||
Roland Boley (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Markus Ebner (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-05-30 | ||||
Georg Heinle (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-12-02 | ||||
Walter Kubanczyk (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-05-01 | ||||
Bernd Zimmermann (until 1984-06-30) | 1952-10-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erich Steer (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-11-28 | ||||
Dieter Kohnle (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-04-03 | ||||
Gunnar Weiss (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-15 | ||||
Branko Milosevic (until 1986-12-31) | 1964-08-21 | ||||
Frank Elser (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-10-05 | ||||
Maximilian Hauck (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-08-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Neipp (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-05-24 | ||||
Bruno Seiler (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-07-02 | ||||
Sebastiano Testa (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-02-26 | ||||
Miroslav Vucinic (until 1984-06-30) | 1956-01-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Robert Birner (from 1983-10-03) (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-16 | ||||
Josef Beller (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-05-18 | ||||
Joachim Lengerer (until 1984-06-30) | 1957-07-14 | ||||
Adolf Schick (until 1984-06-30) | 1964-04-24 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1983-08-27 15:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |