Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Manfred Krafft (until 1985-06-30) | 1937-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Gerry Ehrmann (until 1995-06-30) | 1959-02-18 | ||||
Armin Reichel (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-01-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Axel Roos (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-08-19 | ||||
Herbert Hoos (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-07-18 | ||||
Wolfgang Wolf (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-09-24 | ||||
Michael Dusek (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-11-10 | ||||
Hans-Werner Moser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-09-24 | ||||
Stefan Majewski (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-01-31 | ||||
Andreas Brehme (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Kurt Lang (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-06-18 | ||||
Gerhard Bold (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-03-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Markus Schupp (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-01-07 | ||||
Patrick Mohr (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-09-29 | ||||
Werner Melzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-02 | ||||
Reiner Geye (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-11-22 | ||||
Tino Lochelt (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-08-13 | ||||
Dieter Kitzmann (until 1985-11-15) | 1964-07-11 | ||||
Norbert Eilenfeldt (until 1984-12-04) | 1956-02-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dieter Trunk (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-22 | ||||
Bruno Hubner (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-01-28 | ||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-11-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |