Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1986-04-11) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Carsten Hallmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-10-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Kellner (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Schlegel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-03-09 | ||||
Detsi Kruszynski (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-14 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Michael Nushohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-08-14 | ||||
Reinhard Brendel (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-12-21 | ||||
Ernst Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | ||||
Kurt Knoll (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-07-16 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Guido Szesni (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-06-30 | ||||
Stefan Jambo (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-08-02 | ||||
Michael Blattel (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-29 | ||||
Sascha Jusufi (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-01-20 | ||||
Jean-Santos Muntubila (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Michael Kuntze (from 1984-11-01) (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-06-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Herbert Demange (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-05-24 | ||||
Norbert Honnscheidt (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-11-03 | ||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1986-04-12) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Pierre Dickert (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-08-03 | ||||
Egbert Zimmermann (until 1984-09-30) | 1962-02-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 19:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-12-22 15:30 |
0 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-02-06 20:00 |
3 : 0 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-02-16 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-04-06 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |