Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Fuchs (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-10-25 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Johannes Kau (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-04-10 | ||||
Valentin Herr (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Johannes Nelles (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-02-05 | ||||
Eugen Hach (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-09-19 | ||||
Bernhard Olck (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-10-23 | ||||
Friedhelm Frenken (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-09-02 | ||||
Rolf Grunther (until 1985-06-30) | 1951-02-11 | ||||
Jo Montanes (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-08-15 | ||||
Holger Neumann (until 1985-06-30) | 1965-11-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Norbert Buschlinger (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-12-06 | ||||
Jurgen Willkomm (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-09-07 | ||||
Andreas Brandts (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-04-09 | ||||
Dean Thomas (until 1985-09-10) | 1961-12-19 | ||||
Dietmar Poque (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Tim Gerhards (until 2016-06-30) | 1995-03-13 | ||||
Mario Krohm (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-06-02 | ||||
Gernot Ruof (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-02-10 | ||||
Gunter Delzepich (until 1986-08-27) | 1958-03-21 | ||||
Gunter Habig (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-12-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-12-22 15:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |