Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Gerd Roggensack (until 1986-02-15) | 1941-10-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1993-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Dirk Hellmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-08-31 | ||||
Reiner Wilk (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-11-22 | ||||
Michael Richter (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-12-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Ellguth (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Thomas Helmer (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Franco Foda (until 1985-09-15) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Norbert Dronia (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-19 | ||||
Dirk Hupe (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-05-29 | ||||
Detlef Schnier (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-08-05 | ||||
Volker Kemper (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-10-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Schroder (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Ulrich Buscher (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-10-20 | ||||
Pasi Rautiainen (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-18 | ||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Wolfgang Pohl (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-12-30 | ||||
Stefan Kuhlhorn (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Jorg Breski (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-05-28 | ||||
Michael Butz (until 1985-06-30) | 1965-12-25 | ||||
Eftimios Kompodietas (until 1985-06-30) | 1965-02-03 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Kazuo Ozaki (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-03-07 | ||||
Stefan Pater (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-10-31 | ||||
Stefan Butz (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-09-13 | ||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Matthias Westerwinter (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-09-28 | ||||
Dr. Jorg Weber (until 1985-06-30) | 1965-08-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |