Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1986-10-14) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Agaciak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-17 | ||||
Dirk Heinen (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-05-23 | ||||
Robert Hemmerlein (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-12-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Karl Richter (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-03-27 | ||||
Kees Bregman (until 1985-06-30) | 1947-08-08 | ||||
Thomas Esche (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-10-12 | ||||
Janus Gudlaugsson (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-10-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Ralf Aussem (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Achim Kropp (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-01-09 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Wirtz (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-12-10 | ||||
Dieter Finkler (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-11-10 | ||||
Jurgen Baier (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Michael Kuntze (until 1984-10-31) | 1958-06-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Helmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-06-27 | ||||
Ralf Schlosser (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-07 | ||||
Dieter Lemke (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-04-14 | ||||
Dirk Kurtenbach (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Hermann-Josef Werres (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-04-10 | ||||
Eduard Kirschner (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-11-09 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-09-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-10-02 00:00 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:00 |
4 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |