Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Brei (from 1985-04-15) (until 1987-04-02) | 1950-09-30 | ||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1985-04-14) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Greiner (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-08-08 | ||||
Frank Kurth (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-03-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Holger Fach (until 1987-12-31) | 1962-09-06 | ||||
Manfred Bockenfeld (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-23 | ||||
Werner Jakobs (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-08-09 | ||||
Dietmar Grabotin (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-28 | ||||
Gunter Kuczinski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-07 | ||||
Michael Bunte (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-02-06 | ||||
Peter Lohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-01 | ||||
Anton Schmidkunz (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andreas Kaiser (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-05-04 | ||||
Josef Weikl (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-01-15 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Gerd Zewe (until 1987-06-30) | 1950-06-13 | ||||
Rudi Bommer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Jurgen Fleer (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-02-26 | ||||
Heinrich Bless (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Sven Demandt (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-02-13 | ||||
Gunter Thiele (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-11-07 | ||||
Hasse Holmqvist (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-04-27 | ||||
Atli Edvaldsson (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-03-03 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-11-20 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |