Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1985-12-03) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1985-12-03) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Norbert Henkel (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-01-31 | ||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dieter Timme (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-09-23 | ||||
Heiko Meier (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-06 | ||||
Bayram Cakal (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-02-04 | ||||
Frank Wormuth (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-13 | ||||
Hans Weiner (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Michael Sziedat (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-08-22 | ||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Edi Stohr (until 1985-06-30) | 1956-09-17 | ||||
Wildmann (until 1985-06-30) | |||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ayhan Bilek (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-12-31 | ||||
Jorg Bluthmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-09-02 | ||||
Uwe Kollmannsperger (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-07-19 | ||||
Hubert Clute-Simon (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-07-05 | ||||
Axel Fischer (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-05-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Heikko Glode (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Wolfgang Metzler (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-06-23 | ||||
Diego Castro (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-10-10 | ||||
Soren Skov (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-02-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:00 |
4 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1985-02-05 20:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |