Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1986-01-04) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Kneuer (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-03-26 | |||
1 | Hans Wulf (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Greizer (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-08-23 | ||||
3 | Volker Munn (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-01-10 | |||
4 | Stefan Panierschky (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | |||
4 | Mike Kahlhofen (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-10-01 | |||
4 | Uwe Beginski (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-12-13 | |||
4 | Bernd Kapke (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-09-20 | |||
5 | Stefan Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | |||
5 | Walter Horch (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-10-11 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Uwe Eplinius (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-09-07 | ||||
Thomas Freudenstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-04-28 | ||||
6 | Uwe Schreml (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-02-07 | |||
9 | Horst Knauf (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-16 | |||
10 | Dirk Bakalorz (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-08-22 | |||
11 | Karl Bonisch (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-05-24 | |||
13 | Jurgen Kirchberg (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-09-04 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Michael Deuerling (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-02-12 | |||
8 | Peter Cestonaro (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-14 | |||
10 | Helmut Hampl (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-09-29 | |||
11 | Heinz Traser (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-01-04 | |||
12 | Andreas van der Veldt (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-12-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |