Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Karlheinz Feldkamp (until 1987-06-30) | 1934-06-02 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Werner Vollack (until 1987-11-20) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Dieter Ingendae (until 1985-12-31) | 1959-05-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wolfgang Funkel (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-08-10 | ||||
Dietmar Klinger (until 1991-06-30) | 1958-01-08 | ||||
Matthias Herget (until 1989-06-30) | 1955-11-14 | ||||
Werner Buttgereit (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-06-15 | ||||
Ludger van de Loo (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-03-14 | ||||
Norbert Brinkmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-06-16 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Wohrlin (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-07-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Friedhelm Funkel (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-12-10 | ||||
Franz Raschid (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-10-18 | ||||
Toni Puszamszies (until 1985-10-31) | 1958-08-14 | ||||
Wayne Thomas (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-09-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Larus Gudmundsson (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-12-12 | ||||
Horst Feilzer (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-21 | ||||
Peter Loontiens (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Schafer (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-12-04 | ||||
Helmut Gulich (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-01-16 | ||||
Axel Schmidt (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-02-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-11-20 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1984-12-22 13:45 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1985-03-12 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-04-06 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1985-05-26 18:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |