Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Luis Zacarias (until 1985-06-30) | 1942-10-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Preuss (until 1985-06-30) | 1936-11-10 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Heribert Macherey (until 1992-06-30) | 1954-11-03 | ||||
Wolfgang de Beer (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-01-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Patrick Notthoff (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-02-26 | ||||
Michael Struckmann (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Markus Griebling (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-10-24 | ||||
Michael Kaul (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-05-18 | ||||
Markus Kettler (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-08-23 | ||||
Georg Zug (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-06-24 | ||||
Frank Hammerschlag (until 1985-10-31) | 1960-09-28 | ||||
Dietmar Schacht (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-09-28 | ||||
Udo Lay (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-03-13 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Mike Vossnacke (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-01-03 | ||||
Uwe Fecht (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-21 | ||||
Manfred Dubski (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-09-19 | ||||
Franz-Josef Steininger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-07-09 | ||||
Pascal Notthoff (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-27 | ||||
Gunter Schlipper (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-08-13 | ||||
Nebojsa Pesic (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-08-13 | ||||
Hassan Yilderim (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-08-10 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Volker Abramczik (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-05-27 | ||||
Eddie Krncevic (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-08-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1984-10-02 00:00 |
3 : 5 PSO |
Schema Compare |