Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Antun Rudinski (until 1985-12-15) | 1937-10-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Gunther Wienhold (until 1985-06-30) | 1948-01-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rolf Maier (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Klaus Bury (until 1989-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Jurgen Menger (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
Michael Damgen (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-04-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Armin Loffler (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-12-02 | ||||
Axel Lais (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
Ralf Schopperle (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-07 | ||||
Thomas Stickroth (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-04-13 | ||||
Gabor Zele (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-07-08 | ||||
Milorad Pilipovic (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-06-03 | ||||
Henryk Kruppa (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-09-20 | ||||
Hermann Rudolf (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-10-07 | ||||
Hans-Peter Schulzke (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-10-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Franz Weber (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-08-12 | ||||
Uwe Stachelin (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-03-13 | ||||
Benny Wendt (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-11-04 | ||||
Herbert Reiss (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-02-21 | ||||
Hans Meisel (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-12-04 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Mahn (until 1985-06-30) | 1960-10-26 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |