Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Walter Modick (from 1985-04-20) (until 1985-06-30) | 1951-09-24 | ||||
Fritz Fuchs (from 1984-12-16) (until 1985-04-19) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Hannes Baldauf (until 1984-12-15) | 1938-03-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Joachim Juriens (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-08-08 | ||||
Wolfgang Farber (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-09-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schmidt (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Peter Assion (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-08-24 | ||||
Gunter Berti (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-07-31 | ||||
Roland Boley (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Markus Ebner (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-05-30 | ||||
Georg Heinle (until 1985-06-30) | 1957-12-02 | ||||
Walter Kubanczyk (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-05-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Erich Steer (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-11-28 | ||||
Dieter Kohnle (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-04-03 | ||||
Marcus Sorg (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-12-24 | ||||
Gunnar Weiss (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-15 | ||||
Branko Milosevic (until 1986-12-31) | 1964-08-21 | ||||
Peter Kempa (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Rieker (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-08-17 | ||||
Pascal Muller (from 1985-01-01) (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-06-05 | ||||
Frank Elser (until 1985-06-30) | 1958-10-05 | ||||
Maximilian Hauck (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-08-20 | ||||
Wolfgang Neipp (until 1985-06-30) | 1961-05-24 | ||||
Bernd Schuler (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-09-19 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Peter Steck (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Robert Birner (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-16 | ||||
Joachim Zeller (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-20 | ||||
Josef Beller (until 1985-06-30) | 1954-05-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |