Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Klug (from 1984-09-26) (until 1986-09-10) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Lothar Kleim (until 1984-09-25) | 1936-10-27 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilhelm Huxhorn (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-09-20 | ||||
Frank Berlepp (until 1985-06-30) | 1959-02-22 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gerhard Lachmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-01-28 | ||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Peter Salisch (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-25 | ||||
Rolf Dohmen (until 1985-06-30) | 1952-04-04 | ||||
Jochen Dorrich (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-01-23 | ||||
Ludek Macela (until 1985-06-30) | 1950-10-03 | ||||
Gunther Reeg (until 1985-06-30) | 1968-07-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Volker Kispert (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-25 | ||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Oliver Posniak (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Rafael Sanchez (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-23 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (from 1985-01-01) (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Thomas Rossberger (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-10-02 | ||||
Bernd Krajczy (until 1985-06-30) | 1962-05-30 | ||||
Andreas Bordan (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-05-14 | ||||
Runald Ossen (until 1985-06-30) | 1963-05-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Kuhl (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-24 | ||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Egbert Zimmermann (from 1984-10-01) (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-02-19 | ||||
Zoltan Grujic (until 1985-06-30) | 1966-11-28 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1984-09-01 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |