Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Otto Rehhagel (until 1995-06-30) | 1938-08-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Dieter Burdenski (until 1988-06-30) | 1950-11-26 | ||||
Klaus Funk (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-02-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Schaaf (until 1995-06-30) | 1961-04-30 | ||||
Gunnar Sauer (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-06-11 | ||||
Jonny Otten (until 1992-06-30) | 1961-01-31 | ||||
Michael Kutzop (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-03-24 | ||||
Bruno Pezzey (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-02-03 | ||||
Axel Noruschat (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-01-31 | ||||
Rigobert Gruber (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-05-14 | ||||
Yasuhiko Okudera (until 1986-06-30) | 1952-03-12 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Kamp (until 1985-06-30) | 1946-09-26 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1985-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Wolter (until 1993-06-30) | 1963-10-04 | ||||
Gunter Hermann (until 1992-11-30) | 1960-12-05 | ||||
Norbert Meier (until 1989-12-31) | 1958-09-20 | ||||
Benno Mohlmann (until 1987-10-04) | 1954-08-01 | ||||
Wolfgang Sidka (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-05-26 | ||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1985-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Frank Neubarth (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-07-29 | ||||
Frank Ordenewitz (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-03-25 | ||||
Rudi Voller (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-04-13 | ||||
Uwe Reinders (until 1985-06-30) | 1955-01-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1984-09-02 15:00 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-11-21 15:30 |
5 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1984-12-12 14:00 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1985-03-12 00:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |