Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolfgang Seel (from 1986-04-12) (until 1986-06-30) | 1948-06-21 | ||||
Walter Muller (from 1986-04-12) (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Uwe Klimaschefski (until 1986-04-11) | 1938-12-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Carsten Hallmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-10-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Kellner (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Norbert Schlegel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-03-09 | ||||
Franco Foda (from 1985-09-16) (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Detsi Kruszynski (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-14 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Rainer Dorr (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-06-04 | ||||
Detlef Schnier (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-08-05 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Boysen (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-05-30 | ||||
Helmut Zahn (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-09-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Guido Szesni (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-06-30 | ||||
Stefan Jambo (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-08-02 | ||||
Jurgen Mohr (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-08-18 | ||||
Michael Blattel (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-29 | ||||
Sascha Jusufi (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-01-20 | ||||
Jean-Santos Muntubila (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-12-20 | ||||
Uwe Hofer (until 1985-11-30) | 1959-07-21 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Rohrbacher (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Herbert Demange (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-05-24 | ||||
Klaus Berge (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-10-04 | ||||
Norbert Honnscheidt (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-11-03 | ||||
Dieter Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-04-01 | ||||
Jurgen Makan (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-07-05 | ||||
Wolfgang Seel (until 1986-04-12) | 1948-06-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 20:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |