Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Horst Franz (from 1986-02-08) (until 1986-10-25) | 1940-06-17 | ||||
Gerd Roggensack (until 1986-02-15) | 1941-10-05 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wolfgang Kneib (until 1993-06-30) | 1952-11-20 | ||||
Dirk Hellmann (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-08-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Ridder (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-09-27 | ||||
Andreas Ellguth (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Thomas Helmer (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-04-21 | ||||
Horst Wohlers (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-08-06 | ||||
Michael Wollitz (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-03-28 | ||||
Franco Foda (until 1985-09-15) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Helmut Schroder (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-03-01 | ||||
Thomas Gerstner (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-11-06 | ||||
Ulrich Buscher (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-10-20 | ||||
Pasi Rautiainen (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-18 | ||||
Uwe Haas (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-02-26 | ||||
Michael Wilke (until 1986-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Ostermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-08-25 | ||||
Kazuo Ozaki (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-03-07 | ||||
Stefan Kohn (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-10-09 | ||||
Stefan Pater (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-10-31 | ||||
Ulrich Kretz (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-01-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-08-25 15:00 |
2 : 0 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |