Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (until 1988-06-30) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Nagel (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-07 | ||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Alois Reinhardt (until 1991-08-31) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Peter Zanter (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-11-11 | ||||
Jurgen Gelsdorf (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-01-19 | ||||
Dieter Bast (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-08-28 | ||||
Rudolf Wojtowicz (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-06-09 | ||||
Dirk Hielscher (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-10-17 | ||||
Roman Geschlecht (until 1985-11-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Anders Giske (until 1985-09-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Knut Reinhardt (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-04-27 | ||||
Florian Hinterberger (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-12-08 | ||||
Falko Gotz (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Minas Hantzidis (until 1987-09-30) | 1966-07-04 | ||||
Gunter Drews (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-07-09 | ||||
Werner Malischke (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-12-07 | ||||
Wolfgang Patzke (until 1986-10-31) | 1959-02-24 | ||||
Jurgen Rober (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-12-25 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Dirk Schlegel (until 1985-11-10) | 1961-06-14 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Christian Schreier (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-02-04 | ||||
Herbert Waas (until 1989-09-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Beom-geun Cha (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-22 | ||||
Frank Glass (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-05-29 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-08-25 15:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 14:30 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-11-16 14:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1985-12-19 19:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |