Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1989-06-30) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Schmidt (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-06 | ||||
Jurgen Haller (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Dieter Brefort (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-05-13 | ||||
Manfred Hellmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-08-16 | ||||
Helmut Schweger (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-06-06 | ||||
Bernd Gerber (until 1987-08-31) | 1961-12-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alan Clarke (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-02-03 | ||||
Hans-Peter Stark (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-09-16 | ||||
Egon Flad (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
Norbert Bebensee (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-07-15 | ||||
Feridun Alkan (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-11-03 | ||||
Vetle Andersen (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Stefan Dinauer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-27 | ||||
Jorg Gaedke (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-11-18 | ||||
Bodo Mattern (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-02-03 | ||||
Christian Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-12-26 | ||||
Peter Saternus (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-07-16 | ||||
Leo Bunk (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-10-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 15:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-11-20 14:00 |
3 : 2 |
Schema Compare |