Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jupp Heynckes (until 1987-06-30) | 1945-05-09 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Wolf Werner (until 1987-06-30) | 1942-04-08 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ulrich Sude (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-19 | ||||
Erik Thorstvedt (from 1985-10-04) (until 1986-12-31) | 1962-10-28 | ||||
1 | Uwe Kamps (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-06-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Eichin (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-10-09 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Bruns (until 1990-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Bernd Krauss (until 1990-06-30) | 1957-05-08 | ||||
Kai-Erik Herlovsen (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-09-25 | ||||
Andre Winkhold (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-03-04 | ||||
Hans-Georg Dressen (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-12-30 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Thomas Krisp (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-09-25 | ||||
Uli Borowka (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-05-19 | ||||
Wilfried Hannes (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-05-17 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Guido Hoffmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-12-20 | ||||
Joachim Gehrmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-05-15 | ||||
Jorg Jung (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-11-22 | ||||
Thomas Herbst (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-10-05 | ||||
Peter Enevoldsen (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-08-14 | ||||
20 | Christian Hochstatter (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-10-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Jorg Criens (until 1993-10-25) | 1960-12-18 | ||||
Christoph Budde (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | ||||
Uwe Rahn (until 1988-10-31) | 1962-05-21 | ||||
Ewald Lienen (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-11-28 | ||||
Frank Mill (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-23 | ||||
Kurt Pinkall (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-06-25 | ||||
Heiko Nickel (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-08-25 15:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |