Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (from 1986-03-15) (until 1986-06-30) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Willibert Kremer (until 1986-03-14) | 1939-10-15 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Heinz Patzig (until 1986-03-14) | 1929-09-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Jorg Hossbach (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-13 | ||||
Waldemar Josef (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-10-25 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Bernd Gorski (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-10-04 | ||||
Michael Scheike (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-09-11 | ||||
Andreas Kubsda (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-15 | ||||
Michael Geiger (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-27 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Heinz-Gunter Scheil (until 1993-01-30) | 1962-11-09 | ||||
Peer Posipal (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-07-03 | ||||
Lars Ellmerich (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-02 | ||||
Heiner Pahl (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-02-27 | ||||
Detlef Lindner (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-29 | ||||
Lutz Fischer (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-03-25 | ||||
Dieter Hoff (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-09-17 | ||||
Reinhold Hintermaier (until 1986-06-30) | 1956-02-14 | ||||
Matthias Bruns (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-08-19 | ||||
Manfred Tripbacher (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-02-23 | ||||
Frank Schon (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-09-22 | ||||
Reinhard Kindermann (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-03-10 | ||||
Stefan Gorges (until 1986-06-30) | 1967-12-15 | ||||
Vasil Ringov (from 1985-11-08) (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-04-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Buchheister (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Andreas Pospich (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-12-08 | ||||
Ronnie Worm (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-10-07 | ||||
Frank Plagge (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Michael Bohnke (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-12-13 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
6 : 3 |
Schema Compare |