Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Fritz Fuchs (until 1986-08-22) | 1943-10-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Klaus Scherer (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-07-01 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Andreas Hentrich (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-04-12 | ||||
Frank Lebong (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Tom Dooley (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-05-12 | ||||
Horst Ehrmantraut (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-12-11 | ||||
Kurt Knoll (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-07-16 | ||||
Kay Friedmann (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-05-15 | ||||
Frank Altherr (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-05-21 | ||||
Jesper Petersen (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-04-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Morsdorf (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-08-12 | ||||
Bernd Beck (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-07-18 | ||||
Frank Niederlander (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-03-25 | ||||
Michael Pfahler (until 1986-06-30) | 1965-11-29 | ||||
Wolfram Schanda (until 1986-06-30) | 1966-07-05 | ||||
Gunther Tilk (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-03-14 | ||||
Gerd Schwickert (until 1986-06-30) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Milan Icin (until 1985-08-31) | 1960-08-08 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Freiler (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-05-02 | ||||
Klaus Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-14 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1986-08-15) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Manfred Lenz (until 1986-06-30) | 1947-11-21 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-08-25 18:00 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1985-09-11 17:30 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-11-16 14:00 |
1 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |