Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1986-10-14) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Agaciak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-17 | ||||
Jacek Jarecki (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-06-26 | ||||
Dirk Heinen (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-05-23 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Karl Richter (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-03-27 | ||||
Norbert Siegmann (until 1986-06-30) | 1953-05-20 | ||||
Thomas Gassmann (until 1986-06-30) | 1967-09-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Ralf Aussem (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Christos Orkas (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Achim Kropp (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-01-09 | ||||
Bernhard Schroder (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-01 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Wirtz (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-12-10 | ||||
Jorg Neun (from 1985-11-16) (until 1986-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Helmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-06-27 | ||||
Leo Lazaro (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-01-17 | ||||
Ralf Schlosser (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-07 | ||||
Dieter Lemke (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-04-14 | ||||
Dirk Kurtenbach (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Hermann-Josef Werres (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-04-10 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |