Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Sundermann (from 1986-04-21) (until 1988-10-12) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Rudi Gutendorf (from 1986-01-08) (until 1986-04-20) | 1926-08-30 | ||||
Hans Eder (from 1985-12-04) (until 1986-01-06) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Uwe Kliemann (until 1985-12-03) | 1949-06-30 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (from 1986-01-07) (until 1990-06-30) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Hans Eder (until 1985-12-03) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Norbert Henkel (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-01-31 | ||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Alf Fistler (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Dieter Timme (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-09-23 | ||||
Heiko Meier (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-01-06 | ||||
Bayram Cakal (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-02-04 | ||||
Frank Wormuth (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-09-13 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Hans Weiner (until 1986-06-30) | 1950-11-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Torsten Gowitzke (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-08 | ||||
Roman Gajda (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Ayhan Bilek (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-12-31 | ||||
Jorg Bluthmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-09-02 | ||||
Roland Kneissl (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-02-05 | ||||
Uwe Kollmannsperger (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-07-19 | ||||
Hubert Clute-Simon (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-07-05 | ||||
Axel Fischer (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-05-27 | ||||
Uwe Schmidt (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-05-31 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thorsten Schlumberger (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-29 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Matthias Westerwinter (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-09-28 | ||||
Heikko Glode (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-07-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1985-08-25 15:00 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |