Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rudolf Kroner (from 1986-01-06) (until 1986-08-21) | 1942-01-06 | ||||
Jorg Berger (until 1986-01-04) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
1 | Thomas Kneuer (until 1997-06-30) | 1963-03-26 | |||
1 | Hans Wulf (until 1986-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Pedro Aguilar (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | ||||
3 | Volker Munn (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-01-10 | |||
4 | Stefan Panierschky (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | |||
4 | Mike Kahlhofen (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-10-01 | |||
5 | Stefan Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-12-29 | |||
5 | Karl-Heinz Neukirch (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-11-21 | |||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Drube (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-10-22 | ||||
Dieter Hecking (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Uwe Eplinius (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-09-07 | ||||
Thomas Freudenstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-04-28 | ||||
6 | Uwe Schreml (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-02-07 | |||
9 | Horst Knauf (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-16 | |||
10 | Dirk Bakalorz (until 1986-06-30) | 1963-08-22 | |||
11 | Karl Bonisch (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-05-24 | |||
Sturm | |||||
7 | Lothar Sippel (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-09 | |||
7 | Michael Deuerling (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-02-12 | |||
8 | Peter Cestonaro (until 1986-06-30) | 1954-05-14 | |||
10 | Terry Scott (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-12-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 15:30 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |