Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Werner Nickel (until 1988-04-18) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Karsten Krannich (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-07-29 | ||||
Thomas Richter (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-02-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Hannes Schuler (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Thomas Schmidt (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-09-19 | ||||
Peter Assion (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-08-24 | ||||
Gunter Berti (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-07-31 | ||||
Bernd Martin (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-02-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dieter Simon (until 1995-06-30) | 1962-07-25 | ||||
Erich Steer (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-11-28 | ||||
Dieter Kohnle (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-04-03 | ||||
Marcus Sorg (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-12-24 | ||||
Kurt Kalchschmid (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-03-22 | ||||
Gunnar Weiss (until 1986-12-31) | 1956-04-15 | ||||
Branko Milosevic (until 1986-12-31) | 1964-08-21 | ||||
Peter Kempa (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-07-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Rieker (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-08-17 | ||||
Pascal Muller (until 1986-06-30) | 1960-06-05 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Spies (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-07-08 | ||||
Hans-Peter Steck (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Werner Nickel (until 1988-06-30) | 1951-08-11 | ||||
Robert Birner (until 1986-06-30) | 1958-02-16 | ||||
Joachim Zeller (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-20 | ||||
Rudi Lorch (from 1985-12-01) (until 1986-06-30) | 1966-01-20 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 16:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-10-19 15:00 |
5 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1985-12-21 13:45 |
3 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |