Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Udo Klug (until 1986-09-10) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilhelm Huxhorn (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-09-20 | ||||
Rainer Berg (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Dorr (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-09-21 | ||||
Gerhard Lachmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-01-28 | ||||
Bernhard Trares (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | ||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Thomas Klepper (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-04-07 | ||||
Peter Salisch (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Volker Kispert (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-25 | ||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Oliver Posniak (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Rafael Sanchez (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-23 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Willy Scheepers (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-04-09 | ||||
Jens Rexhaus (until 1986-06-30) | 1968-02-17 | ||||
Andreas Wolter (until 1986-06-30) | 1967-11-27 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Kuhl (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-24 | ||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Stefan Wober (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-08-23 | ||||
Egbert Zimmermann (until 1986-06-30) | 1962-02-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 16:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |