Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Schlappner (until 1987-06-30) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Ulf Quaisser (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-10-12 | ||||
Alfred Schon (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Rainer Scholz (until 1987-09-30) | 1954-09-03 | ||||
Jurgen Kohler (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Stefan Knapp (until 1986-06-30) | 1957-01-21 | ||||
Volker Schlappner (until 1986-06-30) | 1964-02-18 | ||||
Uwe Wolf (until 1986-06-30) | 1967-08-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Werner Heck (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Maurizio Gaudino (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Dieter Schlindwein (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-07 | ||||
Hans Hein (until 1986-06-30) | 1955-05-29 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 | ||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Fritz Walter (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | ||||
Jozsef Torok (until 1986-11-10) | 1954-01-30 | ||||
Helmut Rombach (until 1986-06-30) | 1961-02-25 | ||||
Thomas Remark (until 1986-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Reiner Edelmann (until 1985-12-31) | 1965-03-19 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1985-08-24 15:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1985-10-17 20:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1985-11-12 19:30 |
5 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1985-12-19 19:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1986-03-25 20:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |