Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (from 1986-09-22) (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Georg Kessler (until 1986-09-22) | 1932-09-23 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Christoph Daum (until 1986-09-21) | 1953-10-24 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bodo Illgner (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-04-07 | ||||
Uwe Brunn (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-11-20 | ||||
Toni Schumacher (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Paul Steiner (until 1991-06-30) | 1957-01-23 | ||||
Andreas Gielchen (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-10-27 | ||||
Dieter Prestin (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-08-23 | ||||
Mathias Honerbach (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-04-13 | ||||
Morten Olsen (until 1989-06-30) | 1949-08-14 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Michel van de Korput (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-09-18 | ||||
David Pizanti (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-05-27 | ||||
Thomas Wichterich (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-11-20 | ||||
Michael Wollitz (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-03-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas Hassler (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-05-30 | ||||
Armin Gortz (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-08-30 | ||||
Stephan Engels (until 1988-12-31) | 1960-09-06 | ||||
Ralf Geilenkirchen (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-04-26 | ||||
Hans-Peter Lehnhoff (until 1987-08-31) | 1963-07-12 | ||||
Uwe Bein (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-09-26 | ||||
6 | Olaf Janssen (until 1996-06-30) | 1966-10-08 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Thomas Allofs (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-11-17 | ||||
Tony Woodcock (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-12-06 | ||||
Robert Schmitz (until 1987-12-31) | 1963-07-01 | ||||
Klaus Allofs (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-12-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
0 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-10-25 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |