Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Walter Muller (from 1987-05-20) (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Otto Luttrop (until 1987-05-19) | 1939-03-01 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Armin Reichel (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-01-31 | ||||
Carsten Hallmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-10-11 | ||||
Stefan Wenzel (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-09-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Wenanty Fuhl (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-12-02 | ||||
Norbert Schlegel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-03-09 | ||||
Bertram Basenach (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-08-29 | ||||
Franco Foda (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-04-23 | ||||
Detsi Kruszynski (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-10-14 | ||||
Walter Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1954-03-28 | ||||
Michael Klinkert (until 1987-06-30) | 1968-07-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Guido Szesni (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-06-30 | ||||
Reinhold Hintermaier (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-02-14 | ||||
Theo Schneider (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-23 | ||||
Aron Schopfer (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-12-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Bernd Rohrbacher (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-09-15 | ||||
Robert Brace (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-12-19 | ||||
Peter Crhak (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-07-18 | ||||
Herbert Demange (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-05-24 | ||||
Klaus Berge (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-10-04 | ||||
Norbert Honnscheidt (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-11-03 | ||||
Christoph Mees (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-06-01 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1986-08-29 19:30 |
2 : 4 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1986-10-24 20:00 |
4 : 0 |
Schema Compare |