Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1989-06-30) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Andreas Maiwald (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Schmidt (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-06 | ||||
Jurgen Haller (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Dieter Brefort (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-05-13 | ||||
Manfred Hellmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-08-16 | ||||
Helmut Schweger (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-06-06 | ||||
Bernd Gerber (until 1987-08-31) | 1961-12-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Dirk Schlegel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-06-14 | ||||
Alan Clarke (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-02-03 | ||||
Hans-Peter Stark (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-09-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Egon Flad (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
Norbert Bebensee (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-07-15 | ||||
Rene Vandereycken (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-07-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Stefan Dinauer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-27 | ||||
Jorg Gaedke (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-11-18 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Riedle (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-09-16 | ||||
Horst Feilzer (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-02-21 | ||||
Bodo Mattern (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-02-03 | ||||
Christian Muller (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-12-26 | ||||
Peter Saternus (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-07-16 | ||||
Selcuk Yula (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-11-08 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
2 : 4 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-10-25 14:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |