Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Willi Reimann (until 1987-11-10) | 1949-12-24 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Helmut Schulte (until 1987-11-10) | 1957-09-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Volker Ippig (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-01-28 | ||||
1 | Klaus Thomforde (until 2000-06-30) | 1962-12-01 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Andre Trulsen (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-28 | ||||
Jens Duve (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-09-25 | ||||
Reinhard Kock (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-09-04 | ||||
Dietmar Demuth (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-01-14 | ||||
Ronald Lotz (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-09-21 | ||||
Jurgen Roloff (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-08-04 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Michael Dahms (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-12-22 | ||||
Dirk Zander (until 1991-06-30) | 1965-05-13 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Bargfrede (until 1989-12-31) | 1959-03-10 | ||||
Stefan Studer (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-01-30 | ||||
Jens Beermann (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-05-04 | ||||
Thorsten Koy (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-10-20 | ||||
Reenald Koch (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-12-19 | ||||
3 | Jurgen Gronau (until 1997-06-30) | 1962-08-25 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Andre Golke (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-08-15 | ||||
Rudiger Wenzel (until 1990-06-30) | 1953-06-03 | ||||
Franz Gerber (until 1988-06-30) | 1953-11-27 | ||||
Fred Klaus (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-02-27 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-10-25 14:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 15:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |