Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Ernst Happel (until 1987-06-30) | 1925-11-29 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerd-Volker Schock (until 1989-12-31) | 1950-04-08 | ||||
Aleksandar Ristic (until 1987-06-30) | 1944-06-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uli Stein (until 1987-07-31) | 1954-10-23 | ||||
Uwe Hain (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-10-18 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dietmar Beiersdorfer (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-11-16 | ||||
Ditmar Jakobs (until 1989-09-21) | 1953-08-28 | ||||
Manfred Kaltz (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-01-06 | ||||
Gerard Plessers (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-03-30 | ||||
Thomas Hinz (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-02-06 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Thomas von Heesen (until 1994-06-30) | 1961-10-01 | ||||
Sascha Jusufi (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-01-20 | ||||
Tobias Homp (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-10-31 | ||||
Heinz Grundel (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-02-13 | ||||
Thomas Kroth (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-08-26 | ||||
Miroslaw Okonski (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-12-08 | ||||
Peter Lux (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-10-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Manfred Kastl (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-09-23 | ||||
Lothar Dittmer (until 1987-12-31) | 1963-09-02 | ||||
Walter Laubinger (until 1987-10-31) | 1967-11-09 | ||||
Frank Schmoller (until 1987-08-31) | 1966-08-21 | ||||
Ralf Balzis (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-07-31 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1986-08-29 18:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1986-10-24 20:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 15:00 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-03-07 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1987-03-31 20:15 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-06-20 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |