Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Wahling (until 1988-09-19) | 1940-12-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Raps (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-10-10 | ||||
Hans Wulf (until 1988-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Bastian Hellberg (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-27 | ||||
Heinz Knuwe (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-01-16 | ||||
Peter Hobday (from 1986-11-24) (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-04-09 | ||||
Karsten Surmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Jens Heimann (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-09-28 | ||||
Roman Geschlecht (until 1986-08-02) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Detlev Dammeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Rachid Belarbi (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-11-07 | ||||
Wayne Thomas (until 1987-09-06) | 1958-09-02 | ||||
Maximilian Heidenreich (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-05-09 | ||||
Jurgen Fleer (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-02-26 | ||||
Stefan Eidinger (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-11-07 | ||||
Martin Giesel (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-11-24 | ||||
Felix Moller (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-08-13 | ||||
Oliver Arlt (until 1987-06-30) | 1969-05-05 | ||||
Uwe Kasper (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-09-24 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1989-11-10) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Frank Hartmann (from 1986-09-01) (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-08-17 | ||||
Michael Gue (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-09-21 | ||||
Jorg Korte (until 1987-06-30) | 1968-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1986-08-29 18:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1986-10-26 14:30 |
3 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-12 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |