Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jorg Berger (until 1988-12-31) | 1944-10-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Stephan Lehmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-08-15 | ||||
Siegfried Gruninger (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-06-28 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rolf Maier (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-04-11 | ||||
Udo Lay (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-03-13 | ||||
Martin Krieg (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-11-11 | ||||
Klaus Bury (until 1989-06-30) | 1950-01-24 | ||||
Budimir Vujacic (until 1987-12-31) | 1964-01-04 | ||||
Jurgen Menger (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-02-10 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Karl-Heinz Schulz (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-12-21 | ||||
Thomas Schweizer (until 1991-06-30) | 1967-09-13 | ||||
Joachim Low (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-02-03 | ||||
Maximilian Hauck (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-08-20 | ||||
Armin Loffler (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-12-02 | ||||
Uwe Rapolder (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-05-29 | ||||
Axel Lais (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
Ralf Schopperle (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-11-07 | ||||
Thomas Siegmund (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-11-16 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Franz Weber (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-08-12 | ||||
Souleyman Sane (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-02-26 | ||||
Fred Schaub (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-28 | ||||
Hans Meisel (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-12-04 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
2 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1986-10-24 20:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1986-11-11 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |