Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Dieter Renner (until 1987-06-30) | 1949-12-18 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Armin Jager (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-09-19 | ||||
Waldemar Cimander (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-05-27 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Heribert Stadler (until 1991-06-30) | 1964-01-04 | ||||
Ralf Forster (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-04-25 | ||||
Bernd Schindler (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-12-28 | ||||
Dieter Finke (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-03-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Alois Schwartz (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-03-28 | ||||
Bernd Grabosch (from 1986-11-24) (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-09-23 | ||||
Niels Schlotterbeck (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-03-12 | ||||
Hans Hein (until 1989-06-30) | 1955-05-29 | ||||
Frank Elser (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-10-05 | ||||
Andreas Kleinhansl (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-12-21 | ||||
Anthony Baffoe (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-05-25 | ||||
Christian Streich (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-06-11 | ||||
Arthur Jeske (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-09-12 | ||||
Ali-Riza Yilmaz (until 1987-06-30) | 1968-01-02 | ||||
Peter Hobday (until 1986-11-23) | 1961-04-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Ralf Vollmer (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-07-05 | ||||
Detlef Olaidotter (until 1988-06-30) | 1957-12-29 | ||||
Dirk Kurtenbach (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-02 | ||||
Kazimierz Kmiecik (until 1988-06-30) | 1951-09-19 | ||||
Uwe Fuchs (from 1986-08-16) (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Erwin Waldner (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-08-15 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1986-08-29 17:30 |
0 : 5 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1986-10-26 14:30 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 14:00 |
2 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-03-07 14:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-04-01 16:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-06-20 18:00 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |