Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Eckhard Krautzun (from 1986-09-13) (until 1987-06-30) | 1941-01-13 | ||||
Udo Klug (until 1986-09-10) | 1928-07-21 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Wilhelm Huxhorn (until 1993-06-30) | 1955-09-20 | ||||
Rainer Berg (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-08-21 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Dorr (until 1990-06-30) | 1967-09-21 | ||||
Gerhard Lachmann (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-01-28 | ||||
Bernhard Trares (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-08-18 | ||||
Stefan Glaser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-08-28 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Emig (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-06-29 | ||||
Thomas Klepper (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-04-07 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Volker Kispert (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-25 | ||||
Willi Bernecker (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-03-09 | ||||
Oliver Posniak (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-07-12 | ||||
Rafael Sanchez (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-06-23 | ||||
Stefan Lottermann (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-03-05 | ||||
Thomas Herbst (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-10-05 | ||||
Nenad Salov (from 1986-12-08) (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-10-06 | ||||
Willy Scheepers (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-04-09 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Dieter Gutzler (until 1993-06-30) | 1964-07-28 | ||||
Uwe Kuhl (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-24 | ||||
Michael Kunast (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-02-14 | ||||
Bruno Labbadia (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-02-08 | ||||
Stefan Wober (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-08-23 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Wednesday, 1986-08-27 18:30 |
0 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-10-25 14:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1986-11-19 15:00 |
0 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-03-07 15:30 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |