Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Klaus Schlappner (until 1987-06-30) | 1940-05-22 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gunter Sebert (from 1986-07-11) (until 1988-11-16) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Uwe Zimmermann (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-02-11 | ||||
Gregor Quasten (until 1987-06-30) | 1952-10-03 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Roland Dickgiesser (until 1994-06-30) | 1960-11-09 | ||||
Dimitrios Tsionanis (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Ulf Quaisser (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-10-12 | ||||
Alfred Schon (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-12 | ||||
Rainer Scholz (until 1987-09-30) | 1954-09-03 | ||||
Jurgen Kohler (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-10-06 | ||||
Gunter Sebert (until 1987-06-30) | 1948-05-29 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jochen Muller (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-04-18 | ||||
Martin Trieb (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-09-23 | ||||
Werner Heck (until 1988-06-30) | 1955-04-21 | ||||
Jorg Neun (until 1987-11-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Ronny Borchers (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-08-10 | ||||
Maurizio Gaudino (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Karl-Heinz Buhrer (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-10-20 | ||||
Bernd Klotz (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-09-08 | ||||
Bo Elvar Jorgensen (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-02-20 | ||||
Henrik Eichenauer (until 1987-12-31) | 1968-07-07 | ||||
Fritz Walter (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-21 | ||||
Jozsef Torok (until 1986-11-10) | 1954-01-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1986-10-25 15:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |