Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hermann Gerland (until 1988-06-30) | 1954-06-04 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Zumdick (until 1995-06-30) | 1958-05-10 | ||||
Andreas Wessels (until 1995-06-30) | 1964-07-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Rob Reekers (until 1995-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Thomas Kempe (until 1993-06-30) | 1960-03-17 | ||||
Walter Oswald (until 1991-06-30) | 1955-10-08 | ||||
Martin Kree (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-01-27 | ||||
Lothar Woelk (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-08-03 | ||||
Ivan Zugcic (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-05-22 | ||||
Jurgen Wielert (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-07-05 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Frank Heinemann (until 1994-06-30) | 1965-01-08 | ||||
Frank Benatelli (until 1993-06-30) | 1962-08-19 | ||||
Thorsten Legat (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-11-07 | ||||
Ata Lameck (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-09-15 | ||||
Franz-Josef Tenhagen (until 1988-06-30) | 1952-10-31 | ||||
Peter Knabel (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-10-02 | ||||
Volker Knappheide (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-03-28 | ||||
Uwe Wegmann (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-01-14 | ||||
Siegfried Bonighausen (until 1987-06-30) | 1955-03-20 | ||||
Michael Kuhn (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-05-06 | ||||
Frank Schulz (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-02-18 | ||||
Ole Moller-Nielsen (from 1986-09-01) (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-11-26 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Jupp Nehl (until 1991-09-30) | 1961-06-13 | ||||
Uwe Leifeld (until 1991-06-30) | 1966-07-24 | ||||
Klaus Fischer (until 1988-06-30) | 1949-12-27 | ||||
Andreas Lubke (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-03-12 | ||||
Rudi Decker (until 1987-06-30) | 1967-08-13 | ||||
Franz Schick (until 1987-06-30) | 1960-06-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |