Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Rolf Grunther (until 1987-08-29) | 1951-02-11 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Christof Rekers (until 1994-06-30) | 1967-08-25 | ||||
Uwe Seiler (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-08-06 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Gellrich (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-09-12 | ||||
Andreas Helmer (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-02-25 | ||||
Neale Marmon (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-04-21 | ||||
Ulf Metschies (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-09-22 | ||||
Gunter Eymold (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-04-17 | ||||
Oskar Bauer (until 1987-06-30) | 1956-09-24 | ||||
Willi Brocks (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-01-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ralf Heskamp (until 1992-06-30) | 1965-09-22 | ||||
Stefan Holze (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-05-14 | ||||
Michael Kalkbrenner (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-07-01 | ||||
Frank Bohne (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-08-22 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Jursch (until 1991-06-30) | 1963-06-20 | ||||
Heikko Glode (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-07-12 | ||||
Paul Linz (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-01-04 | ||||
Gerd Grau (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-07-19 | ||||
Ralf Feuerstein (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-06-16 | ||||
Paul Jaschke (until 1986-12-31) | 1966-04-18 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
6 : 0 |
Schema Compare |