Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Lothar Buchmann (from 1986-12-22) (until 1987-06-30) | 1936-08-15 | ||||
Horst Heese (until 1986-12-21) | 1943-12-31 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Bernd Holzenbein (until 1987-06-30) | 1946-03-09 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Claus Reitmaier (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-03-17 | ||||
Valentin Herr (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-07-11 | ||||
Erik Rasp (until 1987-06-30) | 1966-09-15 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Peter Lohr (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-09-01 | ||||
Michael Sandt (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-12-16 | ||||
Uwe Kramer (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-07-18 | ||||
Karl-Heinz Schmitt (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-09-30 | ||||
Jurgen Brauburger (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-06-07 | ||||
Reinhold Runge (until 1987-06-30) | 1961-05-04 | ||||
Heinz Vetter (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-05-12 | ||||
Dirk Lellek (until 1986-12-31) | 1964-01-03 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Hans-Peter Knecht (until 1990-06-30) | 1960-04-12 | ||||
Matthias Imhof (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-05-25 | ||||
Ingo Aulbach (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-08-05 | ||||
Frank Nitsche (from 1986-11-17) (until 1987-06-30) | 1964-03-18 | ||||
Uwe Dittus (until 1987-06-30) | 1959-08-03 | ||||
Radomir Dubovina (until 1987-06-30) | 1953-08-01 | ||||
Jurgen Baier (until 1987-06-30) | 1958-06-29 | ||||
Dietmar Rompel (until 1987-06-30) | 1962-02-02 | ||||
Detlef Krenz (until 1987-06-30) | 1963-05-08 | ||||
Nenad Salov (until 1986-12-07) | 1955-10-06 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Markus Schafer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-04-16 | ||||
Dieter Lindenau (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-03-09 | ||||
Josef Sarroca (from 1986-12-01) (until 1988-06-30) | 1960-08-12 | ||||
Rudi Gores (until 1987-06-30) | 1957-09-05 | ||||
Holger Friz (from 1986-12-10) (until 1987-06-30) | 1965-04-26 | ||||
29 | Janis Hauser (until 2016-06-30) | 1997-07-12 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1986-08-30 15:30 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |