Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Heinz Hoher (until 1988-06-30) | 1938-08-11 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1990-04-09) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Andreas Kopke (until 1994-06-30) | 1962-03-12 | ||||
Bobby Dekeyser (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-10-07 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Jorg Dittwar (until 1994-06-30) | 1963-08-01 | ||||
Ralf Dusend (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-09-28 | ||||
Anders Giske (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-11-22 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Heidenreich (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-08-17 | ||||
Norbert Wagner (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-04-12 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Joachim Philipkowski (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-02-26 | ||||
Thomas Brunner (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-10 | ||||
Martin Schneider (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-11-24 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Brunner (until 1989-12-31) | 1965-02-02 | ||||
Manfred Schwabl (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-04-18 | ||||
Dieter Lieberwirth (until 1988-12-31) | 1954-01-13 | ||||
Stefan Reuter (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-10-16 | ||||
Frank Greiner (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-07-03 | ||||
Reiner Geyer (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-04-20 | ||||
Roland Grahammer (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-11-03 | ||||
Michael Kroninger (until 1988-06-30) | 1966-12-12 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Rudolf Stenzel (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-06-21 | ||||
Dieter Eckstein (until 1988-10-10) | 1964-03-12 | ||||
Jorn Andersen (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-02-03 | ||||
Ralf Weidhaus (until 1987-12-31) | 1967-09-30 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 20:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:30 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1987-11-10 20:00 |
2 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1988-02-14 14:30 |
3 : 1 |
Schema Compare |