Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Erich Ribbeck (until 1988-06-30) | 1937-06-13 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Bernd Dreher (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-11-02 | ||||
1 | Rudiger Vollborn (until 1999-06-30) | 1963-02-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Erich Seckler (until 1992-06-30) | 1963-09-26 | ||||
Alois Reinhardt (until 1991-08-31) | 1961-11-18 | ||||
Thomas Horster (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-27 | ||||
Jean-Pierre de Keyser (until 1990-12-31) | 1965-04-13 | ||||
Thomas Zechel (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-01-25 | ||||
Peter Zanter (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-11-11 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Andrzej Buncol (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-09-21 | ||||
Knut Reinhardt (until 1991-06-30) | 1968-04-27 | ||||
Florian Hinterberger (until 1990-06-30) | 1958-12-08 | ||||
Ralf Falkenmayer (until 1989-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | ||||
Wolfgang Rolff (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-12-26 | ||||
Christian Hausmann (until 1988-12-31) | 1963-11-21 | ||||
Tita (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-04-01 | ||||
Falko Gotz (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-03-26 | ||||
Dirk Rehbein (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-08-14 | ||||
Dieter Regh (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-07-29 | ||||
Minas Hantzidis (until 1987-09-30) | 1966-07-04 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Marcus Feinbier (until 1992-06-30) | 1969-11-30 | ||||
Christian Schreier (until 1991-06-30) | 1959-02-04 | ||||
Herbert Waas (until 1989-09-30) | 1963-09-08 | ||||
Beom-geun Cha (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-22 | ||||
Klaus Tauber (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-01-17 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |