Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Bernd Hoss (until 1989-06-30) | 1939-06-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Holger Gehrke (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-08-22 | ||||
Reinhard Mager (until 1989-06-30) | 1953-05-02 | ||||
Andreas Maiwald (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-14 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Michael Schmidt (until 1992-06-30) | 1962-08-06 | ||||
Jurgen Haller (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-08-31 | ||||
Robert Holzer (until 1989-12-31) | 1966-08-02 | ||||
Dieter Brefort (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-05-13 | ||||
Manfred Hellmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-08-16 | ||||
Helmut Schweger (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-06-06 | ||||
Bernd Gerber (until 1987-08-31) | 1961-12-21 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Achim Wilbois (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-06-15 | ||||
Dirk Schlegel (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-06-14 | ||||
Waldemar Wielga (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-09-07 | ||||
Frank Nitsche (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-03-18 | ||||
Alan Clarke (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-02-03 | ||||
Hans-Peter Stark (until 1989-06-30) | 1954-09-16 | ||||
Wolfgang Schuler (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-02-17 | ||||
Egon Flad (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-03-05 | ||||
Thomas Ahlgrimm (until 1988-06-30) | 1968-03-07 | ||||
Harald Kapernick (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-01-22 | ||||
Lutz Kapernick (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-04-08 | ||||
Thomas Zwingel (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-09-17 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Thorsten Schlumberger (until 1992-06-30) | 1960-10-29 | ||||
Stefan Dinauer (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-05-27 | ||||
Jorg Gaedke (until 1989-06-30) | 1957-11-18 | ||||
Michael Sahr (until 1988-06-30) | 1969-09-14 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1987-08-28 18:00 |
0 : 3 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1987-10-23 20:00 |
4 : 3 |
Schema Compare |