Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Wolf Werner (until 1989-11-21) | 1942-04-08 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Gerd vom Bruch (until 1989-11-21) | 1941-08-19 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Roger Steiner (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-02-03 | ||||
1 | Uwe Kamps (until 2002-06-30) | 1964-06-12 | |||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Eichin (until 1994-12-31) | 1966-10-09 | ||||
Thomas Huschbeck (until 1992-06-30) | 1967-12-17 | ||||
Hans-Gunter Bruns (until 1990-06-30) | 1954-11-15 | ||||
Bernd Krauss (until 1990-06-30) | 1957-05-08 | ||||
Kai-Erik Herlovsen (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-09-25 | ||||
Andre Winkhold (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-03-04 | ||||
Hans-Georg Dressen (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-12-30 | ||||
Michael Frontzeck (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-03-26 | ||||
Thomas Herbst (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-10-05 | ||||
Thomas Krisp (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-09-25 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jorg Neun (from 1987-12-01) (until 1994-06-30) | 1966-05-07 | ||||
Stefan Effenberg (until 1990-06-30) | 1968-08-02 | ||||
Guido Hoffmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-12-20 | ||||
Dirk Bakalorz (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-08-22 | ||||
Andreas Brandts (until 1987-12-31) | 1962-04-09 | ||||
20 | Christian Hochstatter (until 1996-06-30) | 1963-10-19 | |||
Sturm | |||||
Hans-Jorg Criens (until 1993-10-25) | 1960-12-18 | ||||
Christoph Budde (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-02-11 | ||||
Gunter Thiele (until 1989-06-30) | 1961-11-07 | ||||
Uwe Rahn (until 1988-10-31) | 1962-05-21 | ||||
Erik Willaarts (until 1988-10-31) | 1961-08-25 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:30 |
2 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Sunday, 1987-10-25 19:30 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-11-11 20:15 |
3 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |