Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Hannes Linssen (until 1989-09-01) | 1949-09-28 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Frank Agaciak (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-02-17 | ||||
Jacek Jarecki (until 1992-06-30) | 1958-06-26 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Dirk Hielscher (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-17 | ||||
Gunter Hutwelker (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-04-15 | ||||
Friedhelm Frenken (until 1989-06-30) | 1956-09-02 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Jurgen Niggemann (until 1998-06-30) | 1962-01-04 | ||||
Hans-Jurgen Gede (until 1991-06-30) | 1956-11-14 | ||||
Ralf Aussem (until 1991-06-30) | 1960-09-01 | ||||
Anthony Baffoe (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-25 | ||||
Christiaan Pfortner (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-03-03 | ||||
Michael Hagele (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-03-11 | ||||
Hartmund Pitten (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-05-21 | ||||
Norbert Richartz (until 1989-03-29) | 1969-01-25 | ||||
Christos Orkas (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-08-25 | ||||
Axel Stoffel (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-07-18 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Uwe Fuchs (until 1989-06-30) | 1966-07-23 | ||||
Uwe Helmes (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-06-27 | ||||
Leo Lazaro (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-01-17 | ||||
Ralf Schlosser (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-04-07 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Friday, 1987-08-28 17:30 |
1 : 6 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:30 |
1 : 0 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1987-12-10 20:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Tuesday, 1988-03-08 00:00 |
4 : 1 |
Schema Compare |