Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Wahling (until 1988-09-19) | 1940-12-06 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Raps (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-10-10 | ||||
Hans Wulf (until 1988-06-30) | 1951-10-31 | ||||
Christian Handschug (until 1988-06-30) | |||||
Abwehr | |||||
Mathias Kuhlmey (until 1997-06-30) | 1966-02-28 | ||||
Karlheinz Geils (until 1990-06-30) | 1955-05-20 | ||||
Bastian Hellberg (until 1990-06-30) | 1962-10-27 | ||||
Holger Willmer (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-09-25 | ||||
Heinz Knuwe (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-01-16 | ||||
Peter Hobday (until 1988-06-30) | 1961-04-09 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Martin Groth (until 1995-06-30) | 1969-10-20 | ||||
Karsten Surmann (until 1992-06-30) | 1959-10-05 | ||||
Bernd Dierssen (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-08-28 | ||||
Detlev Dammeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1968-10-18 | ||||
Gunter Drews (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-07-09 | ||||
Andreas Muller (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-12-13 | ||||
Rachid Belarbi (until 1988-06-30) | 1964-11-07 | ||||
Andreas Reinke (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-01-03 | ||||
Wayne Thomas (until 1987-09-06) | 1958-09-02 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Siegfried Reich (until 1989-11-10) | 1959-09-29 | ||||
Stefan Kohn (until 1989-06-30) | 1965-10-09 | ||||
Gregor Grillemeier (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-02-17 | ||||
Frank Hartmann (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-08-17 | ||||
Andreas Pallasch (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-07-22 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Saturday, 1987-08-29 15:00 |
3 : 0 |
Schema Compare |