Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Jurgen Sundermann (until 1988-10-12) | 1940-01-25 | ||||
Co-Trainer | |||||
Hans Eder (until 1990-06-30) | 1934-11-14 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Walter Junghans (until 1993-12-31) | 1958-10-26 | ||||
Alfred Weh (until 1988-06-30) | 1962-06-17 | ||||
Abwehr | |||||
Frank Mischke (until 1991-06-30) | 1961-06-19 | ||||
Eugen Kaminski (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-08-16 | ||||
Christian Niebel (until 1990-06-30) | 1959-11-03 | ||||
Taskin Aksoy (until 1989-06-30) | 1967-06-13 | ||||
Alf Fistler (until 1989-06-30) | 1964-10-03 | ||||
Dieter Timme (until 1988-06-30) | 1956-09-23 | ||||
Robert Juttner (until 1988-06-30) | 1959-11-24 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Marco Zernicke (until 1994-06-30) | 1969-12-05 | ||||
Torsten Gowitzke (until 1993-06-30) | 1967-01-08 | ||||
Jurgen Rinke (until 1990-06-30) | 1963-09-10 | ||||
Stephan Tauber (until 1989-12-31) | 1966-10-08 | ||||
Thomas Freudenstein (until 1989-06-30) | 1962-04-28 | ||||
Roman Gajda (until 1989-06-30) | 1958-03-13 | ||||
Sezgin Aksakal (until 1988-06-30) | 1968-01-20 | ||||
Sturm | |||||
Helmut Rombach (until 1989-12-31) | 1961-02-25 | ||||
Frank Dietrich (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-12-02 | ||||
Zbigniew Krawczyk (until 1989-06-30) | 1960-05-01 | ||||
Peter Saternus (until 1988-06-30) | 1967-07-16 | ||||
Lim Theong Kim (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-04-11 | ||||
Andreas Vogler (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-02-05 |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1987-08-30 15:00 |
1 : 3 |
Schema Compare |
||
Saturday, 1987-10-24 15:00 |
1 : 2 |
Schema Compare |