Shirt | Player name | Birthday | |||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trainer | |||||
Helmut Horsch (until 1989-06-30) | 1948-10-12 | ||||
Torwart | |||||
Ralf Mester (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Abwehr | |||||
Thomas Knauer (until 1994-06-30) | 1964-02-02 | ||||
Jorg Silberbach (until 1993-06-30) | 1965-03-08 | ||||
Frank Vollmer (until 1990-06-30) | 1964-07-28 | ||||
Christoph Stech (until 1989-06-30) | 1959-08-01 | ||||
Mittelfeld | |||||
Ulli Gaher (until 1991-06-30) | 1962-01-06 | ||||
Dirk Bremser (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-10-01 | ||||
Jurgen Koop (until 1990-06-30) | 1961-01-28 | ||||
Maik Thiemann (until 1990-06-30) | 1966-09-23 | ||||
David Bennett (until 1989-06-30) | 1961 | ||||
Justus Stech (until 1989-06-30) | |||||
Peter Frassmann (until 1988-06-30) | 1958-07-20 | ||||
Herbert Hrubesch (until 1988-06-30) | |||||
Klaus Huckschlag (until 1988-06-30) | 1965-09-11 | ||||
Oliver Kemper (until 1988-06-30) | |||||
Sturm | |||||
Guido Fleige (until 1992-06-30) | 1964-05-07 | ||||
Ludger Pickenacker (until 1990-06-30) | 1965-02-08 | ||||
Stefan Gradler (until 1988-06-30) | 1963-06-05 | ||||
Siggi Riemann (until 1988-06-30) |
Date | Links | |||
---|---|---|---|---|
Sunday, 1987-08-30 15:00 |
1 : 1 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-10-07 20:00 |
0 : 2 |
Schema Compare |
||
Friday, 1987-10-23 20:00 |
2 : 2 a.e.t. |
Schema Compare |
||
Wednesday, 1987-11-11 20:00 |
0 : 1 |
Schema Compare |
||
Thursday, 1987-12-10 20:00 |
2 : 3 |
Schema Compare |